SOMALI AUTISM AWARENESS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
spreading autism to our community to remove the stigma about it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Belgium
- Canada
- Denmark
- Djibouti
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Italy
- Kenya
- Norway
- Somalia
- United States
Governance
- 19 June 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
abdirisak mohamed | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASHA OSMAN | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIMA LID OSMAN | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £785 | £3.00k | £904 | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87k | £669 | £2.85k | £869 | £886 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM OR OTHER SPECIAL HEALTH NEEDS(IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PEOPLE OF SOMALI ORIGIN)AND TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL STRESS OF PARENTS/CARERS AND THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN WITH SUCH CONDITIONS IN THE UK AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD BY PROVIDING A SAFE STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT AS WELL AS UP TO DATE INFORMATION,ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER SERVICES AND ORGANISATIONS.2.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE WITH AUTISM OR OTHER SPECIAL HEALTH NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheers Cheers Ltd
Westlink House
981 Great West Road
BRENTFORD
Middlesex
TW8 9DN
- Phone:
- 07429225722
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window