HIGHGATE AND MUSWELL HILL ERUV COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1158668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

development of an Eruv project

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £257

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Camden
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID SAMPSON TEACHER Trustee 27 March 2014
BRITISH FRIENDS OF TIKVAH LAYELED FOUNDATION FOR CEREBRAL PALSY CHILDREN
Received: On time
AMEINU LIMITED
Received: On time
TIMOTHY ARIEH COWEN Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
NEIL STUART COHEN Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
ADRIAN LEON COHEN Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £257
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MUSWELL HILL SYNAGOGUE
31 TETHERDOWN
LONDON
N10 1ND
Phone:
02074907774
Website:

No information available