THE STONEFOLDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to promote the teaching of the Christian religion in the Gateshead district and beyond and in particular to promote and support evangelistic and outreach Christian work in inner city areas and in outdoor pursuits including the provision of staff and materials and transport as may be expedient in connection therewith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 1976: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK UNDERHILL | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Edward James Underhill | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Rathika Proffitt | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £900 | £900 | £932 | £50.65k | £8.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £925 | £932 | £900 | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 August 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN GATESHEAD DISTRICT AND BEYOND AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE EVANGELISTIC AND OUTREACH CHRISTIAN WORK IN THE INNER CITY AREAS AND IN OUTDOOR PURSUITS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF STAFF AND MATERIALS AND TRANSPORT AS MAY BE EXPEDIENT IN CONNECTION THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
GATESHEAD DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 MONKHAMS AVENUE
WOODFORD GREEN
IG8 0EY
- Phone:
- 0777 167 1471
- Email:
- mark.underhill@auctor.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window