ST JOHN'S BRINSCALL OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Out of School Club- Lancashire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lianne Gemma Gristwood | Chair | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Ordish | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Thompson | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Joanne Hawker | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wharton | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Miles Rothwell | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siquia Palmer | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dougan | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.00k | £81.00k | £113.00k | £121.00k | £100.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.00k | £75.00k | £88.00k | £91.00k | £102.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHN'S OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB
ST JOHN'S C/E METHODIST PRIMARY
HARBOUR LANE
BRINSCALL
NR CHORLEY LANCASHIRE
PR6 8PT
- Phone:
- 01254830700
- Email:
- asc@brinscall.lancs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window