MODE REHABILITATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mode Rehabilitation support people to find purpose, hope and meaning in their lives; committed to making life better for people affected by mental illness. Mode provides motivation, openness, diversity and encouragement. Modes guiding principles: Acceptance, Hope, Compassion, Respect, and self-worth. Mode fund raises, through social events; mental health awareness, training; grants; donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,200 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 30 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SCULTHORPE MBE | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW TOTTON CAPTAIN | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MiICHAEL TAYLOR BRIGADIER | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICH GROVER COLONAL | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BEENA MISTRY | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET TADIKONDAS Flt Lt | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN JAMES GERRARD | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JULIAN WOOD | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY RIDGEWAY | Trustee | 30 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.39k | £47.23k | £32.10k | £40.07k | £99.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.74k | £41.76k | £18.09k | £54.84k | £93.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £17.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION,BY COUNSELLING/PSYCHOTHERAPY; PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ADVICE, AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND REHABILITATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Stockport Road East
Bredbury
Stockport
SK6 2AQ
- Phone:
- 07786196734
- Email:
- info@moderehabilitation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window