Financial history GLOBAL ONE 2015

Charity number: 1158310
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £496.56k £992.81k £608.17k £471.62k £659.12k
Total expenditure £563.62k £903.55k £646.82k £458.98k £658.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £26.75k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £9.00k £10.00k N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £982.80k £598.17k N/A £612.12k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £11 £4 N/A £24
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £46.98k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £742.90k £549.56k N/A £655.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £160.64k £97.26k N/A £2.67k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £9.92k £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0