RAINBOW CHILD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds during the year for future projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cambodia
- Malawi
- Serbia
- South Africa
- Syria
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 26 August 2014: Standard registration
- RCF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHICO SLIMANI | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DANIYELA RAKIC SLIMANI | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £68 | £2.91k | £3.97k | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.64k | £13.72k | £2.80k | £4.06k | £108 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 November 2024 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 November 2024 | 640 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 November 2024 | 1005 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 June 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED ON 23/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH OVERSEAS AID AND FAMINE RELIEF AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND RELIEVING SICKNESS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4D
Old Pill Farm Industrial Estate
The Pill
CALDICOT
Gwent
NP26 5JH
- Phone:
- 07921298412
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window