NER CHODESH

Charity Number: 1158842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £25,240
Total expenditure: £38,981

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN GILBEY Chair 10 October 2014
None on record
Mark Uri Steinberg Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
SAMUEL ISSAC BASS Trustee 10 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £29.03k £15.45k £11.10k £122.72k £25.24k
Total expenditure £27.55k £11.41k £12.30k £109.40k £38.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.25k £500 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 30 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 09 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 09 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 19 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
158 Cromwell Road
SALFORD
M6 6DE
Phone:
01617929461
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available