Jamiah Education and Relief Trust

Charity number: 1160260
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of financial hardship among people living in the District of Jambusar in the State of Gujarat, India, by providing such persons with grants, goods and services to support their basic needs of education, food, clothing and shelter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £123,530
Total expenditure: £63,591

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • JAMIAH ULOOMUL QURAN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ABDULHAI MUNSHI Trustee 28 April 2019
ISLAMIC RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: 52 days late
MARGUB HUSSAIN MUNSHI Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record
AMJAD AHMED KHANIA Trustee 13 February 2014
DARUL ULOOM DEOBAND UK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.29k £89.93k £197.10k £77.50k £123.53k
Total expenditure £17.53k £47.16k £147.44k £54.62k £63.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 March 2025 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 March 2025 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 April 2022 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 April 2022 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36 Warren Street
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF12 9LX
Phone:
07818065448
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available