FRIENDS OF LANGHAM DOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are: 1. To preserve and maintain for the public benefit the Scheduled Ancient Monument known as Langham Dome at Cockthorpe Road, Langham, Norfolk. 2. To advance the education of the public in the history of Langham Dome and the R.A.F Airfield at Langham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick John Stafford Allen BEM | Chair | 07 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Charles Monteith | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Flynn | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Caroline Pridham | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Allan George Parker | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cole | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BARRY QUARLES BACK | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|||||
ROLAND LITHGOW GOODISON MBE FCMA | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Henry Douglas Labouchere | Trustee | 14 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.51k | £207.91k | £54.15k | £54.62k | £53.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.63k | £48.19k | £60.00k | £66.01k | £64.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.00k | £258 | £610 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE SCHEDULED ANCIENT MONUMENT KNOWN AS LANGHAM DOME AT COCKTHORPE ROAD, LANGHAM, NORFOLK. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF LANGHAM DOME AND THE R.A.F AIRFIELD AT LANGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Close
North Street
Langham
Holt
NR25 7DG
- Phone:
- 01328830348
- Email:
- admin@langhamdome.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window