BLUEPRINT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement for the benefit of the public of civic responsibility and good citizenship by promoting responsible standards in business through the application of the Blueprint Principles and Framework
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2014: Standard registration
- BLUEPRINT FOR BETTER BUSINESS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mary Johnstone-Louis | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Justin John Keeble | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Cooper Twentyman | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES MICHAEL HARRY WOOKEY | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Celine Hirigoyen | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kevin Barry | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Maaike De Bie | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Eamon McCafferty | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £523.92k | £709.60k | £877.28k | £394.80k | £478.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455.43k | £501.06k | £453.54k | £575.76k | £477.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £522.91k | £709.55k | £877.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £634 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £378 | £48 | £60 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £455.43k | £501.06k | £424.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.98k | £7.90k | £8.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £29.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF 1) CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP BY PROMOTING RESPONSIBLE STANDARDS IN BUSINESS THROUGH THE APPLICATION OF THE PRINCIPLES AND FRAMEWORK; AND 2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT PROMOTE THE PRINCIPLES AND FRAMEWORK AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quality House
5-9 Quality Court
Chancery Lane
London
WC2A 1HR
- Phone:
- 07814218901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window