TRAWDEN FOREST COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage & care take a Community Centre which was gifted by asset transfer via the local council. Our aim is to maintain and upkeep the centre, so that people from the local area and it's environs have use of a facility which offers a range of daily group activities and also to enable them to privately hire the centre for family and personal functions. We raise funds continually for its upkeep.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
166 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Boocock | Chair | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Myers | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Karen Bradley | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Cunliffe | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Froud | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jane Swann | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Webber | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Kevin McNulty | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Boocock | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Hodkinson | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Whitaker - Webb | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH KAY BERRIDGE | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Askew | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £356.33k | £77.71k | £113.95k | £143.54k | £179.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.70k | £118.62k | £101.57k | £125.28k | £150.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 08 AUG 2014 AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2017 as amended on 19 May 2022 as amended on 07 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TRAWDEN FOREST AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPTIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trawden Forest Community Centre
Church Street
Trawden
COLNE
Lancashire
BB8 8RU
- Phone:
- 01282 869417
- Email:
- chair@trawdenforest.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window