THE ROYSTON FOOD BANK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run The Royston Food Bank which provides emergency food supplies for those in need. Donated non perishable food food is stored ready for distribution to clients who find themselves unable to provide food for themselves and/or their family. Most clients are referred by partner agencies who may be working with the client on other issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 June 2014: Standard registration
- 03 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROYSTON FOODBANK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.22k | £17.82k | £8.44k | £9.91k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £7.73k | £10.33k | £22.18k | £3.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 03 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ROYSTON HERTFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN A RADIUS OF 7 MILES FROM ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, OR SUCH WIDER AREA AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES AND /OR RELIEF GOODS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE POVERTY. B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY COMMUNICATING AND EXPLAINING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AS OPPORTUNITY PERMITS AND IN RESPONSE TO ENQUIRY, THROUGH INDIVIDUAL OR GROUP DISCUSSION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window