YOUTH@HEART


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 12 March 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE 13-24 WITH CONGENITAL HEART DISEASE IN SOUTH WALES AND THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Newport City
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul James Evans ICAEW, BSc | Chair | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marta Isabel Leao Mooreira Da Cunha | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Anthony Brown | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Innes-Turnill | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Elizabeth Vernon | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Wendy FIELD | Trustee | 14 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/08/2019 | 14/08/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.86k | £78.74k | £155.82k | £64.46k | £57.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.45k | £61.40k | £141.81k | £101.51k | £88.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 August 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Aug 2014 as amended on 16 Oct 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITH CONGENITAL CARDIAC DISEASE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wick Court Cottage
Priding
Saul
Gloucester
GL2 7LG
- Phone:
- 07862007909
- Email:
- contactus@youthatheart.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window