NOTTINGHAM CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities for members and general public. Publications, newsletters, lectures, visits. Local community activities eg consultations on planning matters, advice to local authority, developers and other bodies. Erection of plaques commemorating important local citizens and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 11 December 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Graham Woodward | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY LYNNE KNIGHT | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
ANGELA VIRGINIA MARY PRATTEN | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Needham MA BSc | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ronald Collins MSc FRICS | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Valentine | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Iris Morris | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MAX | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WEIR | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA CLAIRE PINK | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HILARY CLARE BRINDLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FRANKLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY SILVESTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN WELLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
KURT HATTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.70k | £9.43k | £9.74k | £8.63k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.27k | £11.08k | £14.72k | £9.66k | £18.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1975 AS AMENDED ON 11/03/1980 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/1988 AS AMENDED ON 03/02/1990 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2002 as amended on 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A KELVIN ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 2PR
- Phone:
- 01159504464
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window