ASSOCIATION OF HISPANISTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The AHGBI?s activities relate to the advancement of education for the public benefit in Great Britain and Ireland in the languages of the Iberian Peninsula (including Spanish, Portuguese, Catalan, Basque and Galician), and those cultures associated with them throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2014: Standard registration
- AHGBI (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Catherine Boyle | Chair | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Loreto Romero | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aaron Matthew Kahn | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Thompson | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Sarah Wright | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mara Fuertes Gutierrez | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.29k | £17.59k | £13.96k | £16.07k | £14.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £10.86k | £8.56k | £23.02k | £27.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND THE STUDY OF THE LANGUAGES OF THE IBERIAN PENINSULA (INCLUDING SPANISH, PORTUGUESE, CATALAN, BASQUE AND GALICIAN), AND THOSE CULTURES ASSOCIATED WITH THEM THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; (B) TO ENCOURAGE SCHOLARLY RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THESE LANGUAGES AND CULTURES; TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF PROFESSIONALS IN THE RELEVANT AREAS OF STUDY AND PROMOTE THEIR ENGAGEMENT IN HIGHER EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND; TO SUPPORT THE USE, APPLICATION AND IMPACT OF SCHOLARLY RESEARCH IN THAT CONTEXT; TO SUPPORT GRADUATE STUDENTS AND FUTURE PROFESSIONALS IN THE FIELD; (C) TO SECURE THE SUPPORT OF GOVERNMENTS AND OF OTHER APPROPRIATE AGENCIES AND INSTITUTIONS FOR THOSE ACTIVITIES AND TO PROMOTE THE WIDEST POSSIBLE AWARENESS OF THEIR CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL IMPORTANCE; TO WORK WITH OTHER ORGANIZATIONS AND PROFESSIONAL BODIES TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND THE STUDY OF HISPANIC LANGUAGES AND CULTURES AT ALL LEVELS OF SOCIETY IN THE UK AND IRELAND, ESPECIALLY IN SECONDARY AND TERTIARY EDUCATION INSTITUTIONS; (D) TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR THE DISCUSSION AND ELABORATION OF THESE AIMS BY MEMBERS AND TO CONSULT AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANIZATIONS IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF COMMON OBJECTIVES, IN PARTICULAR WITH THE BRITISH ACADEMY AND THE ASOCIACI?N INTERNACIONAL DE HISPANISTAS (AIH).
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OPEN UNIVERSITY
WALTON HALL
MILTON KEYNES
MK7 6AA
- Phone:
- 01908654224
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window