PONDHEAD CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a conservation charity set up to restore 76 hectares of woodland which form part of the Crown lands of the New Forest, known as Pondhead Inclosure near Lyndhurst, Hampshire. We operate under a 10 year license from the Forestry Commission and our aim is to improve the area's biodiversity and public enjoyment by management of the woodland with a team of conservation volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 August 2014: Standard registration
- PCT (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK ARNOLD TIPPETTS | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Bumfrey | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THORNE | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lewis | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Frost | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Wayne Melton | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Philip Barker | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robin Mair | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|||||
John Andrew Stride | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Perry Bond | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.02k | £9.19k | £11.87k | £10.37k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.51k | £11.78k | £10.68k | £7.46k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/07/2014
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF PONDHEAD INCLOSURE, LYNDHURST, HAMPSHIRE, BY PROMOTING ITS BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (FLORA AND FAUNA), INCLUDING BY ENSURING THAT THERE IS A SUCCESSION PLAN FOR ITS FUTURE COPPICE AND WOODLAND UNDERSTORY MANAGEMENT, AND FACILITATING PUBLIC ACCESS TO IT INSOFAR AS THIS IS COMPATIBLE WITH THE FOREGOING. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF PONDHEAD INCLOSURE, LYNDHURST, INCLUDING THROUGH SCHOOL VISITS AND THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Penhale Way
Totton
SOUTHAMPTON
SO40 7JU
- Phone:
- 07818038295
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window