PINK EVENTS UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and promote and protect good health amongst those who are at risk of or who have been dignosed with breast cancer in such ways as the trustees shall think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2014: Standard registration
- Sarah's Pink Events (Working name)
- PINK EVENTS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL YOUNG | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Nicholas O'Rourke | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN YOUNG | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KIMBERLEY O'ROURKE | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MANDY ANITA BELLFIELD RGN | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.44k | £11.90k | £36.63k | £42.05k | £42.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.55k | £5.37k | £2.78k | £8.55k | £76.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 March 2023 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF, OR WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH BREAST CANCER IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING AND IMPROVING RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT FOR PATIENTS AND CONSULTANTS AS APPROPRIATE TO IMPROVE CARE, TREATMENT AND DIAGNOSIS OF BREAST CANCER; B) RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT AND REMINDING PEOPLE TO CHECK THEMSELVES; AND C) RAISING FUNDS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF BREAST CANCER, ITS CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Chestnut Way
Leeds
LS16 7TN
- Phone:
- 07890697277
- Email:
- committee@pinkevents.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window