THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST

Charity number: 1158552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Madness and Mayhem Trust provides funds for children and young people to take part in activities where the Christian religion is advanced. The Trust's funds are particularly aimed at enabling children and young people to benefit from attending a Madness and Mayhem holiday, where otherwise because of personal circumstances, this would not be possible.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £10,305
Total expenditure: £1,842

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 September 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV NEIL BARBER Chair 02 May 2007
CHADDESDEN ANGLICAN EVANGELICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES', NORMANTON BY DERBY
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Ben Kirsch Trustee 31 July 2015
None on record
VIC KILGOUR Trustee 24 June 2011
None on record
JENNY JACKSON Trustee 22 June 2009
None on record
JEN COTTINGHAM Trustee 02 August 2007
None on record
CAROLE SWINBURN Trustee 02 May 2007
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES', NORMANTON BY DERBY
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST CIO
Recently registered
RUPERT WEBSTER Trustee 02 May 2007
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S EASTROP BASINGSTOKE
Received: On time
THE MADNESS AND MAYHEM TRUST CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.03k £15.54k £29.46k £35.85k £10.31k
Total expenditure £1.72k £17.42k £33.38k £38.57k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
55 HIGHFIELD ROAD
LITTLEOVER
DERBY
DE23 1DH
Phone:
01332765333
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available