Accounts and annual returns ANIMAL SPAY AND NEUTER INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1157935
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 12 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2015 11 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 11 January 2016 On Time