ANIMAL SPAY AND NEUTER INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRAVELLING TO IMPOVERISHED COUNTRIES WITH A VETERINARY TEAM TO STERILIZE PEOPLES CATS AND DOGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bulgaria
- Greece
- Portugal
- Romania
- United States
Governance
- 22 July 2014: Standard registration
- 15 July 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 15 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1172316 ANIMAL SPAY AND NEUTER INTERNATIONAL
- ASNI (Working name)
- ROMANIA ANIMAL RESCUE DBA ANIMAL SPAY AND NEUTER INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.76k | £184.53k | £72.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.60k | £183.12k | £76.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 12 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 12 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 11 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 11 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 11 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 11 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2014
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN IMPOVERISHED REGIONS OF THE WORLD:- 1)TO PROMOTE HUMAN BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING A FREE STERILIZATIONS BY A QUALIFIED VETERINARY TEAM FOR CATS AND DOGS; AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TALKS TO EXPLAIN THE IMPORTANCE OF THE STERILIZATION OF PETS IN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND BY TRAINING LOCAL VETERINARY SURGEONS IN KEYHOLE STERILIZATION PROCEDURES AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON SUCH ISSUES.
Area of benefit
IN IMPOVERISHED REGIONS OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window