WIMBORNE MINSTER CHURCH ESTATE

Charity Number: 1159374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Trustees of a Fund owning two properties the income of which is for: A Fabric Sinking Fund and Church Heating and Lighting Wimborne Minster

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £66,706
Total expenditure: £52,122

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Canon ANDREW JOHN WILLIAM ROWLAND Chair 05 September 2018
BROWN HABGOOD HALL AND HIGDEN CHARITY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF WIMBORNE MINSTER
Received: On time
EDMUND BARNES CHARITY FOR ORGAN AND CHOIR FUND OF WIMBORNE MINSTER
Received: On time
WIMBORNE MINSTER CHURCH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE GOVERNORS OF WIMBORNE MINSTER - PRIEST'S HOUSE MUSEUM LEGACY
Received: On time
GILLINGHAM'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRANK KERRIDGE TRUST
Received: On time
HANHAM TRUST
Received: On time
F S SEYMOURS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOXLEY
Received: On time
WIMBORNE MINSTER MUSICAL HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew John Patrick Trustee 25 June 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST CUTHBURGA, WIMBORNE MINSTER
Received: On time
BRUCE PHILIP JENSEN Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £63.90k £53.50k £64.06k £56.64k £66.71k
Total expenditure £60.97k £90.94k £124.25k £40.81k £52.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 14 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 November 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 November 2023 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE GOAT HOUSE
PINE ROAD
CORFE MULLEN
WIMBORNE
BH21 3DW
Phone:
01202884753
Website:

No information available