Financial history NORTON DISNEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 504773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £6.72k £11.41k £3.64k £4.12k £5.68k
Total expenditure £3.66k £11.84k £5.60k £3.08k £5.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A