Trustees CASTLE DONINGTON VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Charity number: 1157707

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Clark | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Schofield | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Tranmer | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICK FOREY | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Reddish | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEX LOGAN | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS TAYLOR | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SEMONS | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALWYN THORPE | Trustee | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.