DONCASTER AND DISTRICT DEAF SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Doncaster Deaf Society serves and provides a centralised, safe base meeting point of social contact for wellbeing. Services cover BSL Advocacy, Advice & Information to the Doncaster Deaf Community Borough-wide and the provision of five BSL Groups who organise a range of activities & day/weekend trip from early years-elderly: OAP Club, Social Club, Happy Hands Playgroup, Leisure Club & Drama Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,030 from 1 government contract(s) and £3,524 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 02 February 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Cobb | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA NOELENE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK TOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS MARY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Dunn | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £16.91k | £11.38k | £10.35k | £26.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £23.49k | £10.18k | £10.71k | £6.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.85k | £2.64k | £3.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPED 4 MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DEAF PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY THE LAW IN ENGLAND AND WALES TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE NEW METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF DONCASTER.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF DONCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
DONCASTER & DISTRICT DEAF SOCIETY
Deaf Community Centre
Milton Walk
St James Street
DONCASTER
DN1 3QG
- Phone:
- 07777649054
- Website:
-
doncasterdistrictdeafsociety.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window