Financial history ENCOUNTER TRUST WINCHCOMBE

Charity number: 1157308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £161.82k £187.73k £176.69k £226.02k £318.10k
Total expenditure £165.61k £160.46k £177.26k £223.41k £298.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A £2.00k £1.00k