THE FUND FOR INCLUSIVE PROSPERITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL PRINCIPLES IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE WITH A VIEW TO ENSURING THE DISCHARGE BY PERSONS ENGAGED IN INDUSTRY OR COMMERCE OF THEIR SOCIAL OBLIGATIONS TOWARDS THE WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN WHICH THEY OPERATE WORLDWIDE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 February 2016: Standard registration
- COALITION FOR INCLUSIVE CAPITALISM (Previous name)
- THE FUND FOR INCLUSIVE GROWTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Hunston | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
LADY DE ROTHSCHILD | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.49k | £11 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.44k | £897 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 267 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 267 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL PRINCIPLES IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE WITH A VIEW TO ENSURING THE DISCHARGE BY PERSONS ENGAGED IN INDUSTRY OR COMMERCE OF THEIR SOCIAL OBLIGATIONS TOWARDS THE WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN WHICH THEY OPERATE, IN PARTICULAR BY (I) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROMOTING RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND POLITICAL SCIENCES, INCLUDING THE STUDY OF THE PERFORMANCE OF MARKETS AND THE SOCIAL FRAMEWORK WITHIN WHICH THEY OPERATE, BOTH TO BRITAIN AND ABROAD, AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO THE ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL IMPLICATIONS OF GOVERNMENT POLICY AND THE OPERATION OF MARKETS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF: AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS SUBCLAUSE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" SHALL MEAN DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITIES OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; (III) RELIEVING POVERTY BY PROMOTING THE REDUCTION OF INEQUALITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIGGIN OSBORNE FULLERLOVE
95 PROMENADE
CHELTENHAM
GL50 1HH
- Phone:
- 01242710200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window