B CREATIVITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works in Collaboration with Basena Agro Creativity Centre in Uganda to Awaken, Strengthen Creativity, Support and Preserve Child Education. Protect the Environment, Provide Good Health, Financial Support for Children and their Families. Encourages Creativity Processes that make a difference to Young Peoples Lives including Inspiring and Empowering Children to Explore, Develop and Grow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERRICK KITEKE | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET MANGENI | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
HENRY SSEMAKULA | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £831 | £3.27k | £3.99k | £1.25k | £637 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £1.87k | £3.82k | £1.07k | £260 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUCH GRANTS, FINANCIAL SUPPORT, SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT TO SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN UGANDA FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Newall House
Harper Road
London
SE1 6QD
- Phone:
- 07904786479
- Email:
- hbazi@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window