Financial history THE WEETING STEAM ENGINE RALLY

Charity number: 1158906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £108.04k £0 £0 £148.51k £178.88k
Total expenditure £101.53k £11.96k £10.57k £115.44k £133.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A