THE HALO PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Halo Project supports BME women and families with specialist advocacy by promoting the human rights of women through empowerment, education and specialist intervention programmes including emergency specialist accommodation. Our services, programmes & provision enhances safety & protection through trauma-informed approaches developed through lived experiences, preventing abuse and harm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 10 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yasmin Khan | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ho | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saima Hussain | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asma Shaffi | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gray | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Preston | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mirsalehi | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.50k | £170.74k | £352.44k | £412.66k | £452.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.33k | £110.29k | £344.98k | £381.67k | £451.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £71.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.50k | N/A | N/A | £204.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/11/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND, WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OR POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF FORCED MARRIAGE AND/OR "HONOUR" CRIMES, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HALO PROJECT LTD
307-308 Vanguard Suite
BROADCASTING HOUSE
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS1 5JA
- Phone:
- 01642683045
- Email:
- info@haloproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window