TAIBACH COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taibach Community Library operates a volunteer run library in Taibach, South Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 May 2024
Total income includes £5,495 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 26 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Camilla Walker | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Grundy | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Thomas | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Thomas Jenkins | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Alyson Moore | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sean Mark Pursey | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/05/2020 | 06/05/2021 | 06/05/2022 | 06/05/2023 | 06/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £22.50k | £5.12k | £12.69k | £15.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £15.14k | £15.29k | £6.57k | £7.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.30k | £14.00k | £3.20k | £8.50k | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 May 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 May 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 May 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 May 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 May 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Sep 2014 as amended on 09 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ELECTORAL WARDS OF TAIBACH AND MARGAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taibach Library
5 Commercial Road
Taibach
SA13 1LN
- Phone:
- 01639 883831
- Email:
- hello@taibachlibrary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window