Accounts and annual returns THE NORWEGIAN KINDERGARTEN IN LONDON

Charity Number: 1157145
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 November 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window