CATHEDRAL PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OF OF COMMITTED PARENTS AND TEACHERS DEDICATED TO ENRICHING THE SCHOOL EXPERIENCE OF THE CHILDREN AT CATHEDRAL PRIMARY SCHOOL. THE PTA HAS TWO MAIN GOALS: TO FOSTER, BUILD AND SUPPORT A COMMUNITY ACROSS THE PARENTS AND TEACHERS AT THE SCHOOL TO ENRICH THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN AT THE SCHOOL. THIS IS PRIMARILY DONE THROUGH ORGANISING FUND-RAISING EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
Governance
- 12 June 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Rockel | Chair | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jaisleen Panda | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Meaden | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Whittle | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Philp | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Gordon | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £9.99k | £11.00k | £16.23k | £19.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.93k | £31.83k | £8.97k | £13.06k | £15.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOV 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cathedral Primary School
College Square
Bristol
BS1 5TS
- Phone:
- 07823886706
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window