RIVERSDALE SCHOOL PTC

Charity number: 1157541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023

Total income: £22,565
Total expenditure: £17,258

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James East Chair 04 June 2019
None on record
Holly Mackenzie Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/09/2019 05/09/2020 05/09/2021 05/09/2022 05/09/2023
Total gross income £20.55k £25.77k £10.15k £15.60k £22.57k
Total expenditure £20.78k £20.42k £18.64k £15.03k £17.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.23k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2021 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 September 2019 10 July 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RIVERSDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL
302A MERTON ROAD
LONDON
SW18 5JP
Phone:
07814868574
Website:

No information available