THE BIKE RESCUE PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 July 2014: Standard registration
- 20 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BIKE RESCUE PROJECT (Working name)
- BIKE RESCUE (Previous name)
- THE BIKE RESCUE PROJECT CIC (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/05/2014
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS (?OBJECTS?) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (I)THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH, BY ENCOURAGING CYCLING. (II)THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING AND USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS. (III) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY, PARTICULARLY ON THE HIGHWAYS BY THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ROAD SAFETY AND THE SAFE USE OF BICYCLES INCLUDING THEIR MAINTENANCE. (IV)THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF DISCOUNTED RECYCLED BICYCLES. (V)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE YOUNG AND EX-OFFENDERS, IN THE SUBJECTS OF CYCLE MECHANICS, RECYCLING AND SUSTAINABILITY AND ROAD/CYCLE SAFETY, BY WHATEVER MEANS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CYCLING FACILITIES, SERVICES, TRAINING, EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, AND LOBBYING AND CAMPAIGNING IN MATTERS RELATING TO RECYCLING AND CYCLING AND OTHER FORMS OF TRANSPORT. ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS WILL INCLUDE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,TRAINING AND EMPLOYING YOUNG PEOPLE, EX-OFFENDERS AND OTHERS IN NEED TO RECYCLE AND SELL AFFORDABLE BIKES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window