Financial history SERGEANTS' MESS RAF SHAWBURY

Charity number: 1157057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £115.44k £35.88k £55.48k £63.43k £63.67k
Total expenditure £102.08k £27.28k £42.80k £72.98k £66.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A