CYMDEITHAS THEATR TWM OR NANT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through a Management Committee, it runs a community facility for the use of the public; activities include drama, music, dance performances, band practices, Film Club and lectures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £2,041 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Wrexham
Governance
- 11 December 1975: Standard registration
- THEATR TWM OR NANT (Working name)
- CYMDEITHAS THEATR TWM OR NANT ALSO KNOWN AS DENBIGH THEATRE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Davies | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Owen | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALUN HEDDWYN JONES | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||||
GWYNETH MAI KENSLER BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL PARKER MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAYNOR MORGAN REES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.66k | £26.71k | £11.92k | £24.89k | £19.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.62k | £8.24k | £9.84k | £18.00k | £17.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.75k | £1.76k | £1.60k | £2.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE COMMUNITY OF DENBIGH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE ART OF DRAMA AND AMATEUR DRAMATICS BY THE PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF PLAYS AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS.
Area of benefit
DENBIGH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Vale Street
Denbigh
LL16 3BW
- Phone:
- 01745814323
- Email:
- gwynethk@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window