RED SEA SHARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Red Sea Sharks is actively adding to our knowledge and understanding of shark populations in the Red Sea by supporting research projects and data collection. Additionally it is working on increasing the knowledge and awareness of divers and others to understand the conservation issues sharks are facing around the world and to lobby for their protection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Egypt
Governance
- 17 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Clynes | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ann Storrank | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DENISE FLETCHER | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELKE BOJANOWSKI PHD | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89k | £3.86k | £2.20k | £1.99k | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £4.62k | £2.29k | £2.12k | £923 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/02/2015 as amended on 30 Jun 2019 as amended on 28 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION OF ELASMOBRANCHS (SHARKS AND RAYS) IN THE RED SEA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A)EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT SHARK AND RAY BIOLOGY AND BEHAVIOUR; B)CONDUCTING RESEARCH, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE DISSEMINATED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RED SEA MARINE CONSERVATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
165 Radcliffe Road
Golcar
HUDDERSFIELD
HD7 4EZ
- Phone:
- 00447983261063
- Email:
- info@redseasharks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window