Financial history FRIENDS OF CROWN MEADOW

Charity number: 504789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/09/2020 21/09/2021 21/09/2022 21/09/2023 21/09/2024
Total gross income £7.50k £288 £5.89k £5.54k £15.69k
Total expenditure £9.03k £2.33k £3.56k £7.85k £8.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A