SHANTI NEPALI SAMAJ BELAYAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nepali New Year, Nepali Tij, Charity events etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nepal
Governance
- 11 August 2014: CIO registration
- S.N.S.B. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prabin kharal | Chair | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pramod sharma | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
shashanka sharma | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Padam bahadur shahi | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.78k | £14.98k | £14.16k | £33.82k | £30.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.30k | £17.07k | £17.15k | £20.68k | £26.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO ARE: I) TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS OF NEPAL. II)TO AID THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NEPAL BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE NEPALESE CULTURE AND HERITAGE BY HOSTING CULTURAL EVENTS DURING IMPORTANT NEPALESE FESTIVALS OF DASHEIN, TEEJ, TIHAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Salop Close
WEST BROMWICH
West Midlands
West Midlands
B71 2SB
- Phone:
- 07533442111
- Email:
- snsboct12@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window