THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' STOCK HARVARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, and small groups. Taking religious assemblies in the local school. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 07 August 2014: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS' CHURCH STOCK PCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stas | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Miranda Seaman | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CORRINE JAYNE DUTY | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FINCH | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICHARD SAINSBURY | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA RUTH BROWNING | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHRISTINE KING | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN FRANCIS RILSTONE | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ANN COLLIER | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY GEORGE BARKER | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ARNOLD KING | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ROSEMARY SABINE | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR GERRY SCOTT | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alma Clements | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.39k | £98.31k | £82.95k | £83.86k | £300.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.17k | £104.18k | £98.00k | £76.32k | £74.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Hares Chase
Billericay
CM12 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01277624710
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
stockallsaints.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window