MAKTABAH BAB-UL-ILM LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Islamic education, the promotion of religious harmony, the relief of those in need, to help struggling youths find their way in life and also help them with school subjects such as Maths and English. 1. We are collecting funds for Masjid Bab-Ul-Ilm. 2. Our school of thought is Ahle Sunnah wa Jamaa?a Fiqh Hanafi Maslak Deoband.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 October 2014: Standard registration
- MBUI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ABU FARHAN ABDUL RAHEEM | Chair | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nafees Ahmad Rabbani | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Qasim | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Muhammad Haroon Mirza | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.15k | £3.88k | £16.74k | £14.66k | £15.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.35k | £1.90k | £400 | £400 | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE ISLAM AND ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR IN THE SUBJECTS OF MATHS, ENGLISH AND SCIENCE BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES. 3) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 4) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CENTRE, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Bankdale Road
BIRMINGHAM
B8 2AD
- Phone:
- 07576057997
- Email:
- info@mbui.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window