Accounts and annual returns SHAMROCK EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1158847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 December 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2022 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 April 2022 152 days late Download Open in new window