SHAMROCK EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shamrock Education Trust (SET) is a UK based charity which raises funds to support education and children's rights in Nepal. SET comprises three trustees who have all volunteered as teachers in Nepal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nepal
Governance
- 13 October 2014: Standard registration
- SET (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Capt. Duncan Cradden | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Cradden | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cradden | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.78k | £18.81k | £21.12k | £16.54k | £350.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.85k | £51.50k | £41.12k | £20.67k | £31.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2022 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29/08/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE PUPILS AT SHAMROCK SCHOOL IN NEPAL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 The Gables
Haddenham
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 8AD
- Phone:
- +44 7539 467399
- Email:
- duncancradden@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window