CYMFED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Per the Memorandum and Articles of Association the objects of the company are to advance the Roman Catholic Religion by training people in Christian Youth ministry and by supporting young people in Christian living fellowship and service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 August 2014: Standard registration
- CATHOLIC YOUTH MINISTRY FEDERATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon PAUL JAMES SMITH | Chair | 10 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr James Oliver Trewby | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Simon Gore | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Biggins | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Lawrence Kenneth Regan | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dominic Nicholas Howarth | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Satchell | Trustee | 09 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.71k | £62.46k | £49.40k | £181.20k | £146.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.33k | £76.71k | £12.66k | £108.31k | £219.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE 'OBJECTS' OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION BY TRAINING PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN YOUTH MINISTRY AND BY SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE IN CHRISTIAN LIVING FELLOWSHIP AND SERVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CYMFed
39 Eccleston Square
London
SW1V 1BX
- Phone:
- 07528 643420
- Email:
- admin@cymfed.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window