NR2 COMMUNITY SKILLS SHARE

Charity number: 1157844
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity aims to encourage local people to share their skills with others and operates in the area between the Unthank Road and Vauxhall Street in Norwich.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £66,166
Total expenditure: £89,483

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • NONE (Working name)
  • ESSEX STREET COMMUNITY ROOMS (Previous name)
  • NR2 COMMUNITY SKILL SHARE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alys Duberley Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
Nigel Chapman Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Angela Bush Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
EMMA CLARE CORLETT Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
GAIL ELIZABETH SCOTT DURBIN Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
SUSAN GOURVISH Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
Robert Edward Freeman Trustee 14 March 2016
None on record
Elizabeth Anna Rowles Trustee 29 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.69k £41.82k £5.50k £66.79k £66.17k
Total expenditure £2.16k £31.06k £9.91k £13.08k £89.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 November 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 November 2024 21 days late
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 February 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 February 2024 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bread and Roses Community Cafe
26 Suffolk Square
NORWICH
NR2 2AA
Phone:
07787538881
Website:

No information available