FRIENDS OF WEYMOUTH PAVILION COMPLEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING THE WEYMOUTH PAVILION COMPLEX BY FUNDRAISING TO MAKE FINANCIAL GRANTS TO THE PAVILION AND BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERS TO CARRY OUT DUTIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Dorset
Governance
- 20 November 2014: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Krystyna Flirsman | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Page-Nash | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Newton | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER RENDALL | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.58k | £1.63k | £345 | £400 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £524 | £536 | £0 | £0 | £125 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 August 2024 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 MAY 2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS AND CULTURE IN THE WIDEST SENSE, SPECIFICALLY IN SUPPORT FOR THE WEYMOUTH PAVILION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Ambleside
WEYMOUTH
DT3 5HH
- Phone:
- 07753283106
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window