Financial history SUPPORT 4 SUNFLOWERS

Charity Number: 1157438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.86k £6.32k £13.11k £18.37k £48.25k
Total expenditure £0 £35.78k £9.19k £16.26k £50.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A