EUROPEAN NETWORK ON STATELESSNESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ENS is a network of non-governmental organisations, academic initiatives and individual experts committed to address statelessness in Europe. We are dedicated to strengthening the voices of stateless persons in Europe & to advocate for full respect of their human rights.We aim to reach our goals by conducting & supporting legal & policy development, awareness raising & capacity building activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Islington
- Albania
- Andorra
- Armenia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- San Marino
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 01 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Can Jonathan Yuregir | Chair | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Elizabeth Lowe | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Cecile Clerc | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alexia Savva | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Aleksandra Semeriak Gavrilenok | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Greig | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christiana Bukalo | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jean Denise Lambert | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GABOR GYULAI | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Maurice Wren | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
ALLAN LEAS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £304.86k | £504.86k | £457.00k | £588.29k | £431.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.55k | £360.64k | £417.46k | £597.31k | £546.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.32k | N/A | £11.44k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £502.72k | N/A | £576.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | £37 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £819 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £360.64k | N/A | £597.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | £5.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Sep 2014 as amended on 02 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RIGHT TO A NATIONALITY AND THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF STATELESS PERSONS (AS DEFINED) AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS AND COUNCIL OF EUROPE TREATIES, IN PARTICULAR THOSE CONTAINED WITHIN: (I) THE 1966 INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS; (II) THE 1966 INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL RIGHTS; (III) THE 1954 UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION RELATING TO THE STATUS OF STATELESS PERSONS; (IV) THE 1961 UNITED CONVENTION ON THE REDUCTION OF STATELESSNESS; (V) THE 1989 CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD; (VI) THE 1979 CONVENTION ON THE ELIMINATION OF ALL FORMS OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST WOMEN; (VII) THE 1965 INTERNATIONAL CONVENTION ON THE ELIMINATION OF ALL FORMS OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; (VIII) THE 1950 EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS; (VIIII) THE 1997 EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON NATIONALITY; AND (X) THE 2006 EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON THE AVOIDANCE OF STATELESSNESS IN RELATION TO STATE SUCCESSION. THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY MEANS OF ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (D) RESEARCH INTO ISSUES AFFECTING SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (E) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (F) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENTS AND OTHERS ON MATTERS CONCERNING SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (G) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW AFFECTING SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (H) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED LEGISLATION AFFECTING SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (I) RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES CONCERNING SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (K) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (L) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS; (M) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF SUCH HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS AND TO THE EXTENT PERMITTED BY LAW BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH CIO CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. STATELESS PERSONS MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE NOT CONSIDERED AS A NATIONAL BY ANY STATE UNDER THE OPERATION OF ITS LAW (WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE 1954 CONVENTION RELATING TO THE (STATUS OF STATELESS PERSONS), OR AT RISK OF STATELESSNESS ACCORDING TO THIS DEFINITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Stainforth Road
LONDON
E17 9RD
- Phone:
- 02045266653
- Email:
- info@statelessness.eu
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window