Financial history TIGERS4EVER

Charity Number: 1160528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.19k £28.81k £47.47k £57.24k £52.70k
Total expenditure £6.62k £10.90k £25.39k £42.86k £41.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A